NY A05366 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the carrying of service-issued firearms by military personnel at recruiting centers while on duty.
Title
Authorizes the carrying of service-issued firearms by military personnel at recruiting centers while on duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07576 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS