NY A05364 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to establish the care demonstration program, to utilize the state workforce to provide community based care to individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to establish the care demonstration program, to utilize the state workforce to provide community based care to individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Demond Meeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s4998 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.94 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S04998 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.87