NY A05360 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensure of exhibits or entertainment on fair grounds.
Title
Relates to licensure of exhibits or entertainment on fair grounds.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Steven McLaughlin [R] | Asm. Peter Lopez [R] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Frank Skartados [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.488 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1429 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2384 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.247 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.106 |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S02384 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5360