NY A05359 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s2132b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s2132b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the required training for real estate brokers and real estate salespeople relating to fair housing laws and housing discrimination.
Title
Increases the required training for real estate brokers and real estate salespeople relating to fair housing laws and housing discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s2132b |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.319 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02132 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.81