NY A05356 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17Assemblyheld for consideration in ways and means
2020-02-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2020-01-17Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-14Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01499 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback