NY A05351 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits tenants or residents of limited profit housing, or persons acting on their behalf, to copy financial documents pertaining to their projects, subject to a reasonable charge therefor, the maximum of which shall be prescribed by regulation.
Title
Permits tenants or residents of limited profit housing, or persons acting on their behalf, to copy financial documents pertaining to their projects, subject to a reasonable charge therefor, the maximum of which shall be prescribed by regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.594 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a5351 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to housing |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s4131 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.133 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04131 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594