NY A05348 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the deadline for recertification of licenses to carry or possess a pistol or revolver until July 31, 2020.
Title
Relates to extending the deadline for recertification of licenses to carry or possess a pistol or revolver until July 31, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03993 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES