NY A05342 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force for the review of the state administrative procedure act.
Title
Establishes a task force for the review of the state administrative procedure act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02133 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - referred to governmental operations