NY A05339 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5560a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5560a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for state funding to municipalities for early intervention services for toddlers with disabilities and their families.
Title
Provides for state funding to municipalities for early intervention services for toddlers with disabilities and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s5560a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.557 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05560 (Same As) 2021-12-30 - SIGNED CHAP.820