NY A05332 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state aid to libraries and library systems.
Title
Relates to state aid to libraries and library systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | print number 5332a |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to libraries and education technology |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S02857 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.287