NY A05325 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s4117 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.435 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04117 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.530