NY A05321 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the term "reportable business relationship" as it relates to certain employees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Title
Relates to the term "reportable business relationship" as it relates to certain employees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Sponsors
Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.38 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1350 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S202 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.535 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00202 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5321