NY A05318 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.
Title
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | Senate | signed chap.186 |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.119 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2356 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.144 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02356 (Same As) 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186