NY A05306 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - print number 5306a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - print number 5306a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for unjust conviction and imprisonment.
Title
Relates to claims for unjust conviction and imprisonment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Assembly | print number 5306a |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07982 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY