NY A05304 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a mandatory retirement age of 76 for judges and justices.
Title
Provides a mandatory retirement age of 76 for judges and justices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05482 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES