NY A05301 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.
Title
Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.265 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a5301 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.522 |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s3841 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.84 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03841 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.265