NY A05295 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the inability to pay child support an affirmative defense to non-support of child offenses, rather than an element of such offenses.
Title
Makes the inability to pay child support an affirmative defense to non-support of child offenses, rather than an element of such offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02945 (Same As) 2012-03-29 - referred to codes