NY A05294 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-13)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-13)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the eating disorders awareness and prevention program in the department of health.
Title
Establishes the eating disorders awareness and prevention program in the department of health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.360 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1065 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2530A |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.758 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | print number 5294a |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02530 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5294A