NY A05291 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the recall power of the electors to remove an elective officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the recall power of the electors to remove an elective officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-16Assemblyheld for consideration in governmental operations
2020-02-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2020-01-17Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-14Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00556 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback