NY A05274 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds streets and areas to the residential parking system in the village of Cold Spring in the county of Putnam.
Title
Adds streets and areas to the residential parking system in the village of Cold Spring in the county of Putnam.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6360 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.815 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06360 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.446