NY A05264 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s1184a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s1184a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to detaining persons for longer than twenty-four hours.
Title
Relates to detaining persons for longer than twenty-four hours.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Richardson [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s1184a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.556 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5264c |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 5264b |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | print number 5264a |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01184 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to codes