NY A05257 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to orders to surrender eligible weapons; requires the surrender of weapons following a conviction in certain misdemeanor cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to orders to surrender eligible weapons; requires the surrender of weapons following a conviction in certain misdemeanor cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2016-05-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2016-05-03Assemblypassed assembly
2016-01-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.203
2016-01-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-01-06SenateDIED IN SENATE
2015-04-28SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2015-04-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-04-28Assemblypassed assembly
2015-04-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.203
2015-04-22Assemblyreported
2015-02-13Assemblyreferred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback