NY A05255 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To maximize the economic development potential of academic and commer- cial bioscience activity throughout the State.
Title
Creates the bioscience facilities development program; provides grants to local economic development corporations for the purpose of creating a revolving fund for loans to bioscience facilities to assist commercial bioscience companies to remain in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6802 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-30 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.1337 | |
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7228A | |
2010-06-22 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-22 | repassed assembly | |
2010-06-17 | amended on third reading 5255a | |
2010-06-17 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | recalled from senate | |
2010-02-25 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2010-02-25 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-25 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.368 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-26 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-21 | advanced to third reading cal.614 | |
2009-05-19 | reported | |
2009-02-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-11 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07228 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5255A