NY A05254 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s2647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s2647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Erie county medical center corporation to enter into agreements for the creation and operation of a health care delivery system network.
Title
Authorizes the Erie county medical center corporation to enter into agreements for the creation and operation of a health care delivery system network.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s2647 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.495 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.495 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02647 (Same As) 2015-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.20