NY A05237 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5867
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5867
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State Commercial Goods Transportation Industry Fair Play Act"; redefines the definition of "employee".
Title
Enacts the "New York State Commercial Goods Transportation Industry Fair Play Act"; redefines the definition of "employee".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5867 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.627 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | print number 5237b |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | print number 5237a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04589 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05867 (Same As) 2014-01-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
S05867 (Same As) 2014-01-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.20