NY A05228 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - substituted by s5517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - substituted by s5517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that every publisher of a magazine sold by subscription shall disclose by a notice on the billing statement or billing invoice of each magazine mailed pursuant to subscription, a customer service telephone number; such notice shall be printed or written in a clear and conspicuous form.
Title
Requires that every publisher of a magazine sold by subscription shall disclose by a notice on the billing statement or billing invoice of each magazine mailed pursuant to subscription, a customer service telephone number; such notice shall be printed or written in a clear and conspicuous form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5517 |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.367 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.219 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05517 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.474