NY A05224 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for mandatory training for treasurers of political committees once every three years; requires treasurers to complete such training within forty-five days after first being appointed; requires the state board of elections to provide such training in any method it determines, as well as a web-based format; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for mandatory training for treasurers of political committees once every three years; requires treasurers to complete such training within forty-five days after first being appointed; requires the state board of elections to provide such training in any method it determines, as well as a web-based format; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.164 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.434 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03983 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS