NY A05224 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changes in energy service pricing.
Title
Relates to changes in energy service pricing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.366 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.218 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01046 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION