NY A05221 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.228
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.228
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 5221a
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S07057 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7057A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05221
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05221A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05221&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback