NY A05213 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - ordered to third reading rules cal.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - ordered to third reading rules cal.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Title
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.184 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.184 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03361 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION