NY A05200 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - signed chap.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - signed chap.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits physical contact or activity in any organization's initiating ceremony.
Title
Prohibits physical contact or activity in any organization's initiating ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.188 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1409 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2755 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.868 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02755 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5200