NY A05186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - print number 5186a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - print number 5186a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for dispensing emergency contraception under certain conditions; defines emergency contraception.
Title
Provides for dispensing emergency contraception under certain conditions; defines emergency contraception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | print number 5186a |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07860 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION