NY A05177 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.867 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S03350 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE