NY A05175 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notice to individuals eligible for the excess income program of the option to participate in a qualifying pooled trust as a means of qualifying for medical assistance.
Title
Requires written notice to individuals eligible for the excess income program of the option to participate in a qualifying pooled trust as a means of qualifying for medical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.46 |
2017-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.475 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.715 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1241A |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.422 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | print number 5175a |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01241 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5175A