NY A05174 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.
Title
Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-09-21 | Assembly | reference changed to environmental conservation |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00042 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION