NY A05166 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of Buffalo.
Title
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of Buffalo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.77 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5166 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to cities |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.574 |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4911 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.351 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S04911 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.77