NY A05164 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - print number 5164a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing service credit for unpaid or reduced paid child care leave for members of the state police twenty year retirement plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing service credit for unpaid or reduced paid child care leave for members of the state police twenty year retirement plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-18Assemblyprint number 5164a
2024-01-18Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2023-05-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.239
2023-05-24Assemblyrules report cal.239
2023-05-24Assemblyreported
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-03-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-03-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S04136 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A5164
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05164&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05164
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05164&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05164A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05164&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05164&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05164&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback