NY A05155 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the manufacturing and sale of imitation birch and walnut syrups and the branding and labeling of such syrups.
Title
Relates to the manufacturing and sale of imitation birch and walnut syrups and the branding and labeling of such syrups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | signed chap.252 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3669 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.314 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | print number 5155a |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S03669 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5155A