NY A05150 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to qualifications for certain appointed positions with the board of trustees for the state university and the city university of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to qualifications for certain appointed positions with the board of trustees for the state university and the city university of New York.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2023-06-02Assemblyprint number 5150a
2023-06-02Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2023-03-03Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S03473 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback