NY A05147 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - held for consideration in aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - held for consideration in aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a veterans' gerontological advisory committee.
Title
Establishes a veterans' gerontological advisory committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in aging |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S03709 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to aging