NY A05147 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to death and felony crime reports in certain adult care facilities.
Title
Relates to death and felony crime reports in certain adult care facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.228 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.419 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.419 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | print number 5147a |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07607 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - REFERRED TO HEALTH