NY A05142 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to special act school districts and special education; authorizes boards of education of special act school districts to establish fiscal stabilization reserve funds.
Title
Relates to special act school districts and special education; authorizes boards of education of special act school districts to establish fiscal stabilization reserve funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | print number 5142a |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00572 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION