NY A05141 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to include communication support services as a vocational rehabilitation service.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to include communication support services as a vocational rehabilitation service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | print number 5141b |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | print number 5141a |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04256 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 4256B