NY A05131 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.
Title
Relates to liability of members for wages due to laborers, servants or employees by domestic and foreign limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.360 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.283 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05966 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS