NY A05094 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to land designated as a restricted area.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to land designated as a restricted area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4453 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04453 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.349