NY A05082 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Title
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.101 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.734 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.238 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S543 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.204 |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00543 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5082