NY A05081 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - print number 5081a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - print number 5081a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax exemptions for community land trusts and income-restricted homeownership property.
Title
Relates to tax exemptions for community land trusts and income-restricted homeownership property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | print number 5081a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03469 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3469B