NY A05076 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - print number 5076a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - print number 5076a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to maternal depression screenings; requires maternal health care providers providing pre- and postnatal care or pediatric care to the mother's infant to invite the mother to fill out a questionnaire to detect maternal depression.
Title
Relates to maternal depression screenings; requires maternal health care providers providing pre- and postnatal care or pediatric care to the mother's infant to invite the mother to fill out a questionnaire to detect maternal depression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | print number 5076a |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07865 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES