NY A05070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to flood insurance notice in communities bordering Lake Ontario; requires the department of financial services to publish an annual notice with the department's contact information and a statement about flood insurance and how it relates to standard homeowners insurance policies in local newspapers that serve the communities bordering Lake Ontario.
Title
Relates to flood insurance notice in communities bordering Lake Ontario; requires the department of financial services to publish an annual notice with the department's contact information and a statement about flood insurance and how it relates to standard homeowners insurance policies in local newspapers that serve the communities bordering Lake Ontario.
Sponsors
Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.299 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08810 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES