NY A05065 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - print number 5065b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - print number 5065b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class B felony of aggravated assault upon a person less than ten years old and expands criminal use of a firearm in the first degree to include commission of certain felonies on school grounds.
Title
Establishes the class B felony of aggravated assault upon a person less than ten years old and expands criminal use of a firearm in the first degree to include commission of certain felonies on school grounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Assembly | print number 5065b |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | print number 5065a |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01527 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - PRINT NUMBER 1527A